Macklem, Philip Douglas (CPSO#: 69354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone: (705) 653-1140
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILIP DOUGLAS MACKLEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKLEM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1998