Macklin, David Ari (CPSO#: 72775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medcan Clinic
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone: (416) 350-5900
Fax: (416) 350-5981
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Macklin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Macklin ( CPSO# 72775 )

Business Address:
Medcan Clinic
1500 - 150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ARI MACKLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKLIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 May 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History