Mackrell, Estelle Vivienne (CPSO#: 18214)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:English Conjoint Board, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 1961
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997