Maclean, Heather Jean (CPSO#: 68830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 603
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 79813
Fax: (613) 739-6631
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER JEAN MACLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2000