Maclean, James Earle Webster (CPSO#: 51074)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James E. MacLean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 5 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc 111 St. Regis Crescent S Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 10 May 2017


Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Website: www.rsrs.com Telephone: 416-398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: 416-398-5932
Date Received: 03 Oct 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017