Macleod, Arthur Patrick (CPSO#: 55554)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1985 to 14 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010