Macleod, Calum Uisdean Mackenzie (CPSO#: 52195)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Dec 1996