Macleod, Eric Campbell (CPSO#: 19808)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 126 Hyland Drive Sudbury, ON P3E 1R6
Date Received: 07 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 2016