Macleod, John Neil (CPSO#: 21259)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Oshawa Clinic 117 King Street East Oshawa, Ontario L1H 1B9
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 06 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010