Macleod, Valerie Anne (CPSO#: 61678)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 May 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexandra Marine and General
Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone: (519) 524-8323
Fax: (519) 524-8513
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Conlon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Macleod ( CPSO# 61678 )
Dr. P. Conlon ( CPSO# 50253 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
Alexander Marine & General Hospital
120 Napier Street
Goderich ON  N7A 1W5
Phone Number: (519) 524-8323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Aug 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE ANNE MACLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEOD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Aug 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1993