Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Macmillan, David John (CPSO#: 63909)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 35B
2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H2
Phone: (613) 761-6777
Fax: (613) 761-7744
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shamsie-Macmillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shamsie ( CPSO# 63798 )
Dr. D. Macmillan ( CPSO# 63909 )

Business Address:
South Ottawa Medical Centre
2 - 1650 Queensdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1T 1N8
Phone Number: (613) 244-4400

Business Address:
Suite 35B
2121 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 1H2
Phone Number: (613) 761-6777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN MACMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1991 to 14 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992