Macmillan, Suzanne Mary (CPSO#: 54620)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 8225
Station T
Ottawa ON  K1G 3H7
Phone: (613) 725-2000
Fax: 613-725-1300
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Atkins & Macmillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Macmillan ( CPSO# 54620 )
Dr. H. Atkins ( CPSO# 54640 )

Business Address:
Canadian Medical Protective Association
875 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1S 5P1
Phone Number: (613) 725-2000

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Business Address:
University Health Network
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2

Business Address:
Canadian Medical Protective Association
P.O. Box 8225 Station T
Ottawa ON  K1G 3H7
Phone Number: (613) 725-2000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 05 Dec 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE MARY MACMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990