Macnab, Jessica Mary (CPSO#: 61426)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jun 2001