Macnab, Timothy Ian (CPSO#: 56824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
327 Beresford Ave
Toronto ON  M6S 3B4
Phone: (416) 768-3793
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Macnab Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Macnab ( CPSO# 56824 )

Business Address:
327 Beresford Avenue
Toronto ON  M6S 3B4
Phone Number: (416) 768-3793

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY IAN MACNAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACNAB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1987