Macnaughton, Jane Moira (CPSO#: 53881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: Keane, Jane Moira (used until: 10 Jan 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1055 Princess St. P.O. Box 168
Kingston ON  K7L 5V1
Phone: (613) 536-3092
Fax: (613) 536-3185
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE MOIRA MACNAUGHTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACNAUGHTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1985