Macneil, Mary Valerie (CPSO#: 63476)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 1998


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 1998