Macpherson, Alexander Stewart (CPSO#: 20723)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2005