Macritchie, Kenneth John (CPSO#: 32089)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Sheppard Clinic 649 Sheppard Avenue West Toronto, Ontario M3H 2S4 Tel: (416) 630-0610 Fax: (416) 398-5712
Date Received: 15 Apr 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2013