Macsween, Mary Catherine (CPSO#: 58518)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 1991