Mactavish, James Cameron (CPSO#: 65554)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
299 Montreal Road
Vanier ON  K1L 7G1
Phone: (613) 748-0657
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Mactavish and K. Petersen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Petersen ( CPSO# 77387 )
Dr. J. Mactavish ( CPSO# 65554 )

Business Address:
299 Montreal Road
Vanier ON  K1L 7G1
Phone Number: (613) 748-0657

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mattawa General Hospital Mattawa
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES CAMERON MACTAVISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACTAVISH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993