Macvittie, Jerrold Alan (CPSO#: 41056)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Mar 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1964
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Sep 1993