Madala, Kiran (CPSO#: 67962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 300
2025 Midland Ave
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone: (647) 341-3832
Fax: (416) 439-3875
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

125 - 7155 Woodbine Ave
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Canada
Phone: (905) 946-0222
Fax: (905) 946-0225
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

The Scarborough Hospital - General
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough, Ontario
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kiran Madala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Madala ( CPSO# 67962 )

Business Address:
208 - 1585 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 439-9253

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
125 - 7155 Woodbine Avenue
Markham ON  L3R 1A3
Phone Number: (905) 946-0222

Business Address:
2025 Midland Avenue
Suite 300
Scarborough ON  M1P 3E2
Phone Number: (647) 340-3832

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIRAN MADALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADALA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1998