Madan, Minakshi (CPSO#: 66200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room D380
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4119
Fax: (416) 480-4657
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. S. Chauhan & Dr. M. Madan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Madan ( CPSO# 66200 )
Dr. V. Chauhan ( CPSO# 65099 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Peter Munk Cardiac Centre
150 Gerrard Street West
RM 3-522
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
D380 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4546

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 26 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MINAKSHI MADAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1993