Madan, Robert Ian (CPSO#: 72221)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Baycrest Centre
Suite 4C91
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2457
Fax: (416) 785-2450
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Madan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Madan ( CPSO# 72221 )

Business Address:
Baycrest Centre
Department of Psychiatry
Suite 4C91
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT IAN MADAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003