Madappuli, Valarian Angelo (CPSO#: 27135)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ceylon, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, Ontario M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 25 Nov 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2007