Madaro, Grazia Maria Luisa (CPSO#: 25136)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Madaro De Kuczer, Grazi Maria Luisa (used until: 22 Feb 1970 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007