Madden, Joseph Kieran (CPSO#: 43154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Nov 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 0B2
Phone: (705) 495-8115
Fax: (705) 495-8114
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph K. Madden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Madden ( CPSO# 43154 )

Business Address:
400 McKeown Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 0B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Mattawa General Hospital Mattawa
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH KIERAN MADDEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADDEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1986