Madden-Fitzsimons, Therese Mary (CPSO#: 54949)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gaelic

Education:University of Dublin, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Stratford Medical 444 Douro Street Stratford ON N5A 0E6
Date Received: 30 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017