Maddison, George David (CPSO#: 23050)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record should contact: Brantford General Hospital Medical Records Department 200 Terrace Hill Street Brantford, ON N3R 1G9 Tel: (519) 751-5544
Date Received: 08 Jul 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 03 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013