Madon, Shilpa (CPSO#: 75121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: Soni, Shilpa (used until: 11 Jul 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rebecca Medical
170 Rebecca Street
Oakville
L6K 1J6
Oakville ON  L6K 1J6
Phone: (905) 845-9293
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHILPA MADON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2002