Mador, Martin Jeffery (CPSO#: 51081)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 2004