Madronich, John Robert (CPSO#: 55564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
2200 Rutherford Road
Maple ON  L4K 5V2
Phone: (905) 508-1148
Fax: (905) 303-6832
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT MADRONICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MADRONICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1989