Magee, George Craig (CPSO#: 32419)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Mar 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1994