Magee-Adams, Kelly Marian Addea (CPSO#: 74939)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: Magee, Kelly Marian Addea (used until: 10 Jul 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Phone: (807) 346-1240
Fax: (807) 346-8687
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kelly Magee-Adams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Magee-Adams ( CPSO# 74939 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Phone Number: (807) 346-1240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Aug 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY MARIAN ADDEA MAGEE-ADAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGEE-ADAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 25 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2002