Magharious, Lucy Najyb (CPSO#: 70227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
4800 Leslie Street
Willowdale ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 491-2270
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York Family Physicians
After Hours Clinic
2901 Bayview Avenue
PO Box 91130
North York ON  M2K 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (416) 491-6338
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Oct 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUCY NAJYB MAGHARIOUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGHARIOUS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1998