Magliocco, Maria (CPSO#: 60829)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Names: Magliocco Anderson, Maria (used until: 16 Mar 1998 )     Magliocco, Maria (used until: 24 Aug 1994 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: 7057432121
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA MAGLIOCCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGLIOCCO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990