Magner, Peter O'Connell (CPSO#: 33852)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Nephrology
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82512
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Magner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Magner ( CPSO# 33852 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 11 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER O'CONNELL MAGNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGNER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Sep 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1993