Magrabi, Hamdi Hassan (CPSO#: 70555)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Dec 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Dec 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 20 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2000