Magrinat, Gaston Juan (CPSO#: 27678)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Seville, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Research Fellows - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 1991