Maguire, John Anthony (CPSO#: 61546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Vancouver General Hospital
855 12th Avenue West
Vancouver BC  V5Z 1M9
Phone: 604-875-4111 Ext. 61369
Fax: 604-875-5707

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 31 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Neuropathology Effective: 25 May 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ANTHONY MAGUIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAGUIRE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1990