Magwood, Bryan David (CPSO#: 64852)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 1997