Mah, Allison Dawn (CPSO#: 99615)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Feb 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Feb 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Nov 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 11 Jan 2016 to 05 Feb 2016
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Feb 2016