Mah, Beth Lynette (CPSO#: 85908)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Newcastle, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 23 Mar 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Mar 2007 to 15 May 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 2007