Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Mah, Gordon Kenneth (CPSO#: 69210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
111 Main Street West
North Bay ON  P1B 2T6
Phone: (705) 475-1052
Fax: (705) 475-1193
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon K. Mah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Mah ( CPSO# 69210 )

Business Address:
201 - 111 Main Street West
North Bay ON  P1B 2T6
Phone Number: (705) 475-1052

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON KENNETH MAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1997