Mah, Jung Yuey (CPSO#: 28785)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
674 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z6
Phone: (905) 575-3600
Fax: (905) 575-1779
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Y. Mah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Mah ( CPSO# 28785 )

Business Address:
674 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z6
Phone Number: (905) 575-3600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUNG YUEY MAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1976
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Jul 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1977