Mah, Phillip (CPSO#: 63942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3A
747 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3C 1T2
Phone: (416) 423-6000
Fax: (416) 423-7000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phillip Mah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mah ( CPSO# 63942 )

Business Address:
3A - 747 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3C 1T2
Phone Number: (416) 423-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILLIP MAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1992