Mahadevan, Mani Subramaniam (CPSO#: 57050)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Biochemistry Effective: 05 Dec 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Medical Biochemistry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008