Mahaffey, Ryan Howard Philip (CPSO#: 88619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin St.
Ottawa
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: 6136967000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ryan Mahaffey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mahaffey ( CPSO# 88619 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN HOWARD PHILIP MAHAFFEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHAFFEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2013