Mahajan, Ashish (CPSO#: 86734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L4V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Mahajan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mahajan ( CPSO# 86734 )

Business Address:
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Health Sciences North Sudbury
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHISH MAHAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHAJAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012