Maharaj, Amishanker (CPSO#: 20870)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Cape Town, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: The Albany Clinic Mr. James Higginson-Rawlins Tel: (416) 461-9471 ext. 5470
Date Received: 02 Jun 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2011